TX HB2999 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property owned by certain medical centers in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property owned by certain medical centers in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1514 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 1/1/18 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Corporations & Associations
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--General
Science & Technology
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Corporations & Associations
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--General
Science & Technology
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions