TX HB2996 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a state-administered retirement plan; authorizing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a state-administered retirement plan; authorizing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1537 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback