TX HB2993 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public transportation advisory committee.
Title
Relating to the public transportation advisory committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#900 (Y: 117 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Transportation--Mass Transit