TX HB2990 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement to make certain environmental and water use permit applications available online.
Title
Relating to a requirement to make certain environmental and water use permit applications available online.
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#685 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#685 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB348 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Natural Resources
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INTERNET
PERMITS
WATER
Water--Rights
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INTERNET
PERMITS
WATER
Water--Rights