TX HB2988 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization for the conveyance of certain real property from Texas Tech University to Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization for the conveyance of certain real property from Texas Tech University to Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-11HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-26HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-25HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback