TX HB2983 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to medical examinations for certain children entering the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to medical examinations for certain children entering the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1156 (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1156
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-J.E. Johnson
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback