TX HB2976 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authority of the Travis County Healthcare District to appoint, contract for, or employ physicians.
Title
Relating to authority of the Travis County Healthcare District to appoint, contract for, or employ physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-24 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1142 |
2019-04-23 | House | Postponed 4/24/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1142 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Labor
Labor--General
PHYSICIANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TRAVIS COUNTY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT
Hospitals
Labor
Labor--General
PHYSICIANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TRAVIS COUNTY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT