TX HB297 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public school finance system, the elimination of school district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes, and the creation of a joint interim committee on the elimination of those taxes.
Title
Relating to the public school finance system, the elimination of school district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes, and the creation of a joint interim committee on the elimination of those taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1239 (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1239 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 2-Huberty |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-Martinez Fischer, Huberty, and Bernal |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 3-Rodriguez |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 2-Rodriguez |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Goodwin |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District