TX HB297 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of January 9 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of January 9 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback