TX HB2968 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of a golf cart or utility vehicle on a public highway in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of a golf cart or utility vehicle on a public highway in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective immediately
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenatePassed
2017-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback