TX HB2967 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-23)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited balance billing and an independent dispute resolution program for out-of-network coverage under certain managed care plans; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited balance billing and an independent dispute resolution program for out-of-network coverage under certain managed care plans; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors

Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1591 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback