TX HB2962 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.

Sponsors

Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed to 3rd reading as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1211 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1182 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Rule 11, Section 2 RV#1181 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1180 (Y: 47 N: 92 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateReturned from the House for further action
2017-05-26HouseReturned to the Senate for further action
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-16SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-16SenateRead first time
2017-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-11HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2017-05-11HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2962
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02962I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02962H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02962E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02962S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2962&RcdVtNo=1180&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2962&RcdVtNo=1181&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2962&RcdVtNo=1182&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2962&RcdVtNo=1211&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=85
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=86
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments

feedback