TX HB2957 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inspections and examinations by the Railroad Commission of Texas of certain sites and facilities conducted using unmanned aircraft.
Title
Relating to inspections and examinations by the Railroad Commission of Texas of certain sites and facilities conducted using unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#363 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#363 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1583 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Aeronautics
Common Carriers
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Environment
Environment--Air
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Common Carriers
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Environment
Environment--Air
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas