TX HB2951 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the admissibility of certain hearsay statements in the prosecution of certain sexual or assaultive offenses committed against a child or person with a disability.
Title
Relating to the admissibility of certain hearsay statements in the prosecution of certain sexual or assaultive offenses committed against a child or person with a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Disabilities, Persons with
EVIDENCE
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Disabilities, Persons with
EVIDENCE
SEXUAL ASSAULT