TX HB2931 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of an examination and issuance of a temporary receipt for a driver's license by an entity other than the Department of Public Safety.
Title
Relating to the administration of an examination and issuance of a temporary receipt for a driver's license by an entity other than the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1296 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1296 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Education--Driver Education & Training
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses