TX HB293 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit coverage for certain fertility preservation services under certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit coverage for certain fertility preservation services under certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB93 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback