TX HB2929 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit plan coverage for brain injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit plan coverage for brain injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-08 - House - HB 2929Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2013-05-09SenateRead first time
2013-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-08HouseRecord vote
2013-05-08HousePassed
2013-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-30HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-04-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Insurance
2013-03-19HouseRead first time
2013-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback