TX HB2926 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reinstatement of the parent-child relationship with respect to a person whose parental rights have been involuntarily terminated and to certain requirements in relation to the termination of the parent-child relationship or placement of a child in substitute care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reinstatement of the parent-child relationship with respect to a person whose parental rights have been involuntarily terminated and to certain requirements in relation to the termination of the parent-child relationship or placement of a child in substitute care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Amended RV#957 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Amended RV#920 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#957
2021-05-11HousePassed as amended
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-Parker
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#920
2021-05-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-10HouseAmended 3-Darby and Shine
2021-05-10HouseAmended 2-Cook
2021-05-10HouseAmended 1-Parker
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2926
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02926I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02926H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02926E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02926S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02926F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02926H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02926H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02926H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02926H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02926I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02926H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02926E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02926E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2926&RcdVtNo=920&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2926&RcdVtNo=957&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=25

Bill Comments 750

feedback