TX HB2924 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1581 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#732 (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1581
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#732
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2924
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02924I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02924S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02924F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02924S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02924I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02924H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02924E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02924E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02924F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2924&RcdVtNo=732&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2924&RcdVtNo=1581&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback