TX HB2923 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain persons who are disqualified from serving as the personal representative of a decedent's estate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain persons who are disqualified from serving as the personal representative of a decedent's estate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback