TX HB292 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to inclusion of instruction on the trafficking of persons in the basic training curriculum for peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inclusion of instruction on the trafficking of persons in the basic training curriculum for peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1150 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1150
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 12:00 PM
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 11:00 AM
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB3527 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback