TX HB2908 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing patients with certain terminal illnesses and severe chronic diseases to access certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials.
Title
Relating to authorizing patients with certain terminal illnesses and severe chronic diseases to access certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS