TX HB2905 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of Texas Medical Center specialty license plates.
Title
Relating to the issuance of Texas Medical Center specialty license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration