TX HB2894 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to participation in the comptroller's contracts for travel services.
Title
Relating to participation in the comptroller's contracts for travel services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-13 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1122 |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1122 (Same As) 2021-05-28 - Effective immediately