TX HB2894 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of health care fraud; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of health care fraud; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1198 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1198
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HousePosting rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseRecommitted to committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1377 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback