TX HB2891 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain filing and reporting requirements for certain taxable entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain filing and reporting requirements for certain taxable entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-13 - House - HB 2891Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 1/1/16
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2015-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-14SenateRead first time
2015-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-13HouseRecord vote
2015-05-13HousePassed
2015-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-12HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-08HousePostponed
2015-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-06HousePostponed
2015-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2015-03-16HouseRead first time
2015-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback