TX HB2865 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for imposing certain administrative penalties or disgorgement orders by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Title
Relating to procedures for imposing certain administrative penalties or disgorgement orders by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1358 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2865 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02865I.htm |