TX HB2863 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of competitive bidding requirements to expenditures for certain municipal utility facility relocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of competitive bidding requirements to expenditures for certain municipal utility facility relocations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1323 (Y: 106 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1323
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback