TX HB2861 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to provide road services on federal military property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to provide road services on federal military property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#638 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-30SenateRead first time
2019-04-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#638
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23HouseAmended 1-Landgraf
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback