TX HB2861 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to provide road services on federal military property.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to provide road services on federal military property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#638 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#638 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-Landgraf |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |