TX HB2859 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of precious metal held in a precious metal depository located in this state.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of precious metal held in a precious metal depository located in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#976 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#976 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#976 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR95 (Enabling for) 2019-05-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
SB1903 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Property Tax
SB1903 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Property Tax
Subjects
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions