TX HB2858 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to human trafficking signs at abortion facilities and offenses associated with human trafficking and forced abortion; increasing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to human trafficking signs at abortion facilities and offenses associated with human trafficking and forced abortion; increasing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-29HouseRead first time
2017-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback