TX HB2856 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to provider discrimination against a Medicaid recipient or child health plan program enrollee based on immunization status.
Title
Relating to provider discrimination against a Medicaid recipient or child health plan program enrollee based on immunization status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1312 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
DISCRIMINATION
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
IMMUNIZATIONS
MEDICAID
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
IMMUNIZATIONS
MEDICAID