TX HB2855 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the identification of breeder deer by use of microchip implants.
Title
Relating to the identification of breeder deer by use of microchip implants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses