TX HB2847 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing systems in certain criminal proceedings.
Title
Relating to the use of video teleconferencing systems in certain criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-29 | House discharges conferees-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-28 | House discharges conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |