TX HB2846 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of the Allens Creek Reservoir project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of the Allens Creek Reservoir project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#195 (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective immediately
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#195
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-08HouseAmended 1-Farrar
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback