TX HB2846 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the admissibility of certain hearsay statements made by a child abuse victim.
Title
Relating to the admissibility of certain hearsay statements made by a child abuse victim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-30 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
EVIDENCE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
EVIDENCE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against