TX HB2837 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorization agreements between a parent and a relative or other person for the care and custody of the parent's child and an exemption from a licensing requirement; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to authorization agreements between a parent and a relative or other person for the care and custody of the parent's child and an exemption from a licensing requirement; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD CUSTODY
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION