TX HB2828 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the offense of coercing a person to have or seek an abortion and informed and voluntary consent for an abortion; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the offense of coercing a person to have or seek an abortion and informed and voluntary consent for an abortion; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |