TX HB2825 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting requirements for certain loan and title insurance transactions involving foreign companies and real property located near military bases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting requirements for certain loan and title insurance transactions involving foreign companies and real property located near military bases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback