TX HB2825 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the dissolution of a levee improvement district by a commissioners court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the dissolution of a levee improvement district by a commissioners court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1774 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-05HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-27HouseReferred to County Affairs
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback