TX HB2824 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the pilot program for assessing public school students in writing under an alternative method.
Title
Relating to the pilot program for assessing public school students in writing under an alternative method.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts