TX HB2817 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of, punishment for, and deterrence of certain offenses involving cattle, bison, or horses; authorizing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of, punishment for, and deterrence of certain offenses involving cattle, bison, or horses; authorizing an administrative penalty; authorizing an assessment; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1905 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#640 (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#640 (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-02 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
CATTLE RAISERS ASSOCIATION, TEXAS & SOUTHWESTERN
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HORSES
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
CATTLE RAISERS ASSOCIATION, TEXAS & SOUTHWESTERN
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HORSES