TX HB2815 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to early in-person voting by voters who reside at a residential care facility.
Title
Relating to early in-person voting by voters who reside at a residential care facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Disabilities, Persons with
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes
SECRETARY OF STATE
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Disabilities, Persons with
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes
SECRETARY OF STATE