TX HB2812 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the disaster response loan fund and the permissible uses of that fund; making an appropriation.
Title
Relating to the creation of the disaster response loan fund and the permissible uses of that fund; making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#438 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#420 (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#420 (Y: 124 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#438 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#420 |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | House | Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-04-26 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Slaton |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
LOANS
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
LOANS
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control