TX HB2811 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the release of a tier two form listing hazardous chemicals that is in the possession of a political subdivision of this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the release of a tier two form listing hazardous chemicals that is in the possession of a political subdivision of this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2110 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback