TX HB2810 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of individuals who are unemployed due to certain labor disputes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of individuals who are unemployed due to certain labor disputes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2064 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback