TX HB2806 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-06 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning opportunities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning opportunities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback