TX HB2803 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain local laws concerning water and wastewater special districts, including conforming amendments.
Title
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain local laws concerning water and wastewater special districts, including conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CLEARWATER UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
CROCKETT COUNTY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
DALLAS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT NO. 1
EL PASO WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 4
FAYETTE COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
FAYETTE COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT--MONUMENT HILL
GALVESTON COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT NO. 1
GONZALES COUNTY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
HASKELL COUNTY WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT
MESA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
NORTH PLAINS GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
PORT OF HARLINGEN AUTHORITY
SANDY LAND UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SANTA RITA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SARATOGA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SOUTH PLAINS UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Statutory Revision
SUTTON COUNTY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
CROCKETT COUNTY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
DALLAS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT NO. 1
EL PASO WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 4
FAYETTE COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
FAYETTE COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT--MONUMENT HILL
GALVESTON COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT NO. 1
GONZALES COUNTY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
HASKELL COUNTY WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT
MESA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
NORTH HARRIS COUNTY REGIONAL WATER AUTHORITY
NORTH PLAINS GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
PORT OF HARLINGEN AUTHORITY
SANDY LAND UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SANTA RITA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SARATOGA UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
SOUTH PLAINS UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Statutory Revision
SUTTON COUNTY UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT