TX HB2802 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of public school assessment instruments and the temporary suspension of certain accountability determinations for public schools in a school year in which public school operations are disrupted as a result of a declared disaster and the requirement to use those assessment instruments as a criterion for promotion or graduation of a public school student.
Title
Relating to the administration of public school assessment instruments and the temporary suspension of certain accountability determinations for public schools in a school year in which public school operations are disrupted as a result of a declared disaster and the requirement to use those assessment instruments as a criterion for promotion or graduation of a public school student.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1055 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1055 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing